EP0305050 - In-mold labeling apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1994 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.1994 [1994/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graham Engineering Corporation 1420 Sixth Avenue P.O. Box 1104 York Pennsylvania 17405 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/09] | For all designated states Graham Engineering Corporation 1420 Sixth Avenue P.O. Box 1104 York Pennsylvania 17405 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnston, Brian J. 520 DuPont Avenue York Pennsylvania 17403 / US | 02 /
Klinedinst, Paul W. R.D. No. 2, Box 241 Windsor Pennsylvania 17366 / US | [1989/09] | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/34] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | ||
Former [1989/09] | Gray, Robin Oliver BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 88306861.1 | 26.07.1988 | [1989/09] | Priority number, date | US19870090237 | 27.08.1987 Original published format: US 90237 | [1989/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0305050 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0305050 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0305050 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/24 | [1989/09] | CPC: |
B65C9/14 (EP,US);
B29C49/2408 (EP,US);
B29C2049/2454 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18256 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18992 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für das Etikettieren in einer Form | [1989/09] | English: | In-mold labeling apparatus and method | [1989/09] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'étiquettage dans le monde | [1989/09] | Examination procedure | 12.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/49] | 29.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.08.1988 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   02.09.1988 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.08.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0112110 (PLASTIPAK PACKAGING INC [US]); | [A]WO8504309 (HASL SEIGFRIED C [US]); | [A]US4582474 (ZIEGLER WILLIAM E [US]); | [AD]US4616992 (OLES PAUL M [US]) | [A] - F.D. JONES; "Ingenious mechanisms for designers and inventors", vol. 1, 1930, pages 4-7,252-255, Industrial Press, New York, US | Examination | - pages 4-7,252-255, Industrial Press, New York, US |