Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.07.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.08.1992 [1992/35] |
08.08.1990 | First examination report | |
07.11.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.12.1989 [1989/52] |
20.04.1989 | Publication of search report | published on 07.06.1989 [1989/23] |
31.12.1988 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.02.1989 [1989/07] |