EP0301895 - Methods of lining tubular objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.1989 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.04.1989 [1989/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANGUS FIRE ARMOUR LIMITED Bentham Lancaster LA2 7NA / GB | [1989/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sheard, Dennis Richard Brackenber House Brackenber Lane Giggleswick Settle North Yorkshire BD24 0EB / GB | [1989/05] | Representative(s) | Brooke-Smith, Fred, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | [1989/05] | Application number, filing date | 88307033.6 | 29.07.1988 | [1989/05] | Priority number, date | GB19870018212 | 31.07.1987 Original published format: GB 8718212 | [1989/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0301895 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/16 | [1989/05] | CPC: |
F16L55/1651 (EP);
B29C63/343 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Auskleiden von rohrförmigen Gegenständen | [1989/05] | English: | Methods of lining tubular objects | [1989/05] | French: | Méthode de revêtement d'objets tubulaires | [1989/05] | File destroyed: | 09.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 23.02.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2297378 ; | [A]EP0082212 ; | [A]DE2912840 ; | [A]DE2718877 |