EP0303423 - Co-ordinate reading apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1994 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.1994 [1994/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 136 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | For all designated states SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC. 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 136 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morita, Yoshiyuki c/o Seiko Instruments Inc. 31-1 Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/07] | Representative(s) | Miller, Joseph, et al J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row, Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | [1991/34] |
Former [1989/07] | Caro, William Egerton J. MILLER & CO. Lincoln House 296-302 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 88307297.7 | 08.08.1988 | [1989/07] | Priority number, date | JP19870201487 | 12.08.1987 Original published format: JP 20148787 | [1989/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0303423 | Date: | 15.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0303423 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0303423 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06K11/06 | [1989/07] | CPC: |
G06F3/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/07] | Title | German: | Koordinatenlesegerät | [1989/07] | English: | Co-ordinate reading apparatus | [1989/07] | French: | Appareil de lecture de coordonnées | [1989/07] | Examination procedure | 04.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/31] | 14.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59055586 ; | [A]JP57141785 ; | [A]US3732557 (EVANS D, et al); | [A]EP0156593 (AMP INC [US]); | [AP]EP0242598 (IBM [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 159 (P-289), 24th July 1984; & JP-A-59 055 586 (HITACHI SEIKO), & JP59055586 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 245 (P-159)[1123], 3rd December 1982; & JP-A-57 141 785 (FUJITSU K.K.) 02-09-1982, & JP57141785 A 00000000 |