EP0303441 - Thermosetting resin composition for coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.1992 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.1994 | Change - applicant | published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi, 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP | ||
Former [1992/15] | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi, 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | ||
Former [1989/11] | For all designated states Nippon Shokubai Kagaku Kogyo Co., Ltd 1, 5-chome, Koraibashi Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 541 / JP | ||
Former [1989/07] | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Koraibashi, 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adachi, Masato 24-8 Tsukahara 4-chome Takatsuki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Yatagai, Hidetada 23-2 Koushienguchi 3-chome Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [1989/07] | Representative(s) | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 88307349.6 | 09.08.1988 | [1989/07] | Priority number, date | JP19870198236 | 10.08.1987 Original published format: JP 19823687 | [1989/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0303441 | Date: | 15.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0303441 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08G12/30, C08G12/42, C08L61/26, C09D3/50 | [1989/07] | CPC: |
C08L61/26 (EP,KR);
C09D161/26 (EP,KR);
C08G12/30 (EP,KR);
C08G12/42 (EP,KR)
| C-Set: |
C08L61/26, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C09D161/26, C08L2666/02 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/07] | Title | German: | Wärmehärtbare Harzzusammensetzung für Beschichtungen | [1989/07] | English: | Thermosetting resin composition for coating | [1989/07] | French: | Compositions des revêtements à base de résines thermodurcissables | [1989/07] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 09.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/19] | 22.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP50001034B ; | [A]JP48017756B ; | [Y]US2732325 ; | [Y]GB742046 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO); | [Y]DE1071336 ; | [AD]US3379661 (GYNN GILBERT M, et al); | [A]CA338301 (RYGMYR DERVEN T); | [A]FR1090197 (CIBA GEIGY) | [A] - WPI, FILE SUPPLIER, accession no. 75-10098W, Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-B-50 001 034 (ASAHI CHEMICAL) 14-11-1975, & JP50001034B B 00000000 | [A] - WPI, FILE SUPPLIER, accession no. 73-33351U, Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-B-48 017 756 (ASAHI CHEMICAL), & JP48017756B B 00000000 |