EP0303452 - Improvements in or relating to nmr imaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BTG INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 10 Fleet Place London EC4M 7SB / GB | [2000/21] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states BRITISH TECHNOLOGY GROUP LIMITED 10 Fleet Place London EC4M 7SB / GB | ||
Former [1992/21] | For all designated states BRITISH TECHNOLOGY GROUP LIMITED 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | ||
Former [1989/07] | For all designated states NATIONAL RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mansfield, Peter 68 Beeston Fields Drive Beeston Nottingham / GB | 02 /
Howseman, Alistair 46 Ewe Lamb Lane Bramcote Nottingham NG9 3JZ / GB | 03 /
Ordidge, Roger John 70 Priory Road West Bridgford Nottingham / GB | 04 /
Guilfoyle, David Nigel 112 Blake Road West Bridgford Nottingham NG2 5JZ / GB | [1989/07] | Representative(s) | Davis, Norman Norbridge BRITISH TECHNOLOGY GROUP LTD 10 Fleet Place London EC4M 7SB / GB | [1999/34] |
Former [1989/07] | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 88307372.8 | 10.08.1988 | [1989/07] | Priority number, date | GB19870019244 | 14.08.1987 Original published format: GB 8719244 | [1989/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0303452 | Date: | 15.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0303452 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0303452 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01N24/08 | [1989/07] | CPC: |
G01R33/5615 (EP);
G01R33/4822 (EP);
G01R33/5616 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1989/07] | Title | German: | Verbesserung von/verbunden mit NMR-Abbildung | [1989/07] | English: | Improvements in or relating to nmr imaging | [1989/07] | French: | Amélioration à/relative à l'imagerie RMN | [1989/07] | Examination procedure | 11.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/29] | 15.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 18.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.10.1998 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Request for further processing for: | 19.11.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 20.11.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.12.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0103397 ; | [Y]EP0127480 ; | [A]US4567440 | [XD] - MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE vol.1, no. 3., September 1984, pages 370-386, New York, US; P. MANSFIELD: "Spatial Mapping of the chemical Shift in NMR" | [Y] - JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE vol. 54, 1983, pages 338-343, New York, US; S. Ljunggren: " A Simple Graphical Representation of Fourier-Based Imaging Methods" | [A] - JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE vol.51, 1983, pages 147-152, New York, US; A.A. MAUDSLEY ET AL.: "Spatially Resolved High Resolution Spectroscopy by "Four-Dimensional" NMR" | Examination | - MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE vol.1, no. 3., September 1984, pages 370-386, New York, US; P. MANSFIELD: "Spatial Mapping of the chemical Shift in NMR" * pages 380-385: Three-dimensional mapping; figures 1, 5-8 * | - JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE vol. 54, 1983, pages 338-343, New York, US; S. Ljunggren: " A Simple Graphical Representation of Fourier-Based Imaging Methods" * figure 2 * | - JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE vol.51, 1983, pages 147-152, New York, US; A.A. MAUDSLEY ET AL.: "Spatially Resolved High Resolution Spectroscopy by "Four-Dimensional" NMR" 3 page 147, line1- page 148, line 20 * |