EP0307090 - Tobacco blend formation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1994 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rothmans, Benson & Hedges Inc. 1500 Don Mills Road North York (Toronto) Ontario M3B 3L1 / CA | For all designated states ROTHMANS INTERNATIONAL SERVICES LIMITED 15 Hill Street London W1X 7FB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | For all designated states Rothmans, Benson & Hedges Inc. 1500 Don Mills Road North York (Toronto), Ontario M3B 3L1 / CA | ||
For all designated states ROTHMANS INTERNATIONAL SERVICES LIMITED 15 Hill Street London W1X 7FB / GB | |||
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states Rothmans, Benson & Hedges Inc. 1500 Don Mills Road North York (Toronto), Ontario M3B 3L1 / CA | ||
For all designated states ROTHMANS INTERNATIONAL TOBACCO LIMITED 15 Hill Street London W1X 7FB / GB | |||
Former [1989/11] | For all designated states Rothmans, Benson & Hedges Inc. 1500 Don Mills Road North York (Toronto), Ontario M3B 3L1 / CA | ||
For all designated states ROTHMANS INTERNATIONAL SERVICES LIMITED 2-4 Wendover Road Aylesbury Buckinghamshire / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Snaidr, Stanislav Miroslav 4155 Sharonton Court Mississauga Ontario, L5L 1Y9 / CA | 02 /
Brackmann, Warren Arthur 342 Dickson Park Crescent Mississauga Ontario, L5B 1Y4 / CA | 03 /
Nehyo, Takeshi 118 Newton Drive Willowdale Ontario, M2N 2N1 / CA | 04 /
Sheahan, Michael H. 88 Moore Avenue Toronto Ontario / CA | [1989/11] | Representative(s) | Orr, William McLean, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/26] | Orr, William McLean, et al URQUHART-DYKES & LORD 5th Floor, Tower House Merrion Way Leeds West Yorkshire, LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [1989/11] | Geldard, David Guthrie URQUHART-DYKES AND LORD Tower House Merrion Way Leeds West Yorkshire LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 88307375.1 | 10.08.1988 | [1989/11] | Priority number, date | GB19870018949 | 11.08.1987 Original published format: GB 8718949 | [1989/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0307090 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0307090 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A24C5/18 | [1989/11] | CPC: |
A24C5/1821 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/11] | Title | German: | Bildung einer Tabaksmischung | [1989/11] | English: | Tobacco blend formation | [1989/11] | French: | Formation d'un mélange de tabac | [1989/11] | Examination procedure | 05.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/44] | 24.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2170693 (MOLINS PLC); | [A]GB2169486 (IMP GROUP PLC); | [A]GB2168589 (IMP GROUP PLC); | [AD]EP0202874 (ROTHMANS OF PALL MALL [CA]) | Examination | GB2171887 | US3980088 |