EP0304329 - Monoclonal antibodies and hybridomas and sensitized cells for HBs antigen assay [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.1993 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.1994 | Change - applicant | published on 13.07.1994 [1994/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIONOGI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA trading under the name of SHIONOGI & CO. LTD. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/28] | For all designated states SHIONOGI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA trading under the name of SHIONOGI & CO. LTD. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | ||
Former [1989/08] | For all designated states SHIONOGI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA trading under the name of SHIONOGI & CO. LTD. 1-8 Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noto, Akira 5-9-16, Nanpeidai Takatsuki-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
Nakajima, Kunihiro 739-27, Toriya-cho Kashihara-shi Nara / JP | 03 /
Sato, Akihiko 2-3-21, Minamiminohara Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | [1989/08] | Representative(s) | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/42] | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
Former [1989/08] | Bizley, Richard Edward BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88307722.4 | 19.08.1988 | [1989/08] | Priority number, date | JP19870205955 | 19.08.1987 Original published format: JP 20595587 | [1989/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0304329 | Date: | 22.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0304329 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/00, C12N15/00, G01N33/576 | [1989/08] | CPC: |
G01N33/556 (EP,US);
C12P21/00 (KR);
C07K16/082 (EP,US);
C07K16/4283 (EP,US);
C12N15/00 (KR);
G01N33/54393 (EP,US);
G01N33/5764 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/08] | Title | German: | Monoklonale Antikörper und Hybridome und sensibilisierende Zellen für die Untersuchung von HBs-Antigenen | [1989/08] | English: | Monoclonal antibodies and hybridomas and sensitized cells for HBs antigen assay | [1989/08] | French: | Anticorps monoclonaux et hybridomes et cellules sensibilisées pour le dosage des antigènes HBs | [1989/08] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/43] | 14.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/09] | 30.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0027657 (MASSACHUSETTS GEN HOSPITAL [US]); | [A]GB1563839 (BEHRINGWERKE AG); | [A]EP0163312 (DAIICHI PURE CHEMICALS CO LTD [JP]) |