EP0306230 - Recording and/or reproducing apparatus for a magnetic tape cassette [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.1994 [1994/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/10] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mototake, Tatsuya Patents Division Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
Outou, Tatsuyuki Patents Division Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Yoshinori Patents Division Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 04 /
Kawakami. Kenji Patents Division Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [1989/10] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Christopher Hugo, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1989/10] | Application number, filing date | 88307917.0 | 26.08.1988 | [1989/10] | Priority number, date | JP19870217047 | 31.08.1987 Original published format: JP 21704787 | [1989/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0306230 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0306230 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0306230 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G11B15/10, G11B15/20, G11B15/22, G11B15/44 | [1989/10] | CPC: |
G11B15/6658 (EP,US);
G11B15/22 (EP,KR,US);
G11B15/20 (EP,US);
G11B15/442 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1989/10] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Aufzeichnung und/oder Wiedergabe auf eine Magnetbandkassette | [1989/10] | English: | Recording and/or reproducing apparatus for a magnetic tape cassette | [1989/10] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement et/ou de reproduction pour une cassette à bande magnétique | [1989/10] | Examination procedure | 07.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/31] | 11.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP59087642 ; | [A]DE3022780 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [A]DE3542391 (GRUNDIG EMV [DE]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, P field, vol. 8, no. 204, September 18, 1984 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT, page 28 P 301 & JP-A-59 087 642 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.), & JP59087642 A 00000000 |