EP0306307 - Plastic container inspection process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Coca-Cola Company One Coca-Cola Plaza Atlanta, Georgia 30313 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/10] | For all designated states THE COCA-COLA COMPANY One Coca-Cola Plaza Atlanta, Georgia 30313 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harwick, Warren J. 3120 East Kenwood Boulevard Milwaukee, WI 53211 / US | 02 /
Myers, Michael J. 2640 Winthrope Way Lawrenceville, GA 30245 / US | [1992/51] |
Former [1989/10] | 01 /
Harwick, Warren J. 3120 East Kenwood Boulevard Milwaukee Wisconsin 53211 / US | ||
02 /
Myers, Michael J. 2640 Winthrope Way Lawrenceville Georgia 30245 / US | Representative(s) | Calamita, Roberto, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | Calamita, Roberto, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | ||
Former [1989/10] | Watkins, Arnold Jack European Patent Attorney Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88308097.0 | 01.09.1988 | [1989/10] | Priority number, date | US19870092003 | 02.09.1987 Original published format: US 92003 | US19880229839 | 08.08.1988 Original published format: US 229839 | [1989/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0306307 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0306307 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0306307 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/44, G01N27/62, G01N1/00, G01N35/02 | [1989/45] | CPC: |
G01N27/66 (EP,US);
G01N21/00 (KR);
G01N33/0081 (EP,US);
G01N33/44 (KR);
G01N1/2214 (EP,US);
G01N2001/4066 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/10] | G01N33/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/10] | Title | German: | Untersuchungsprozess für Plastikbehälter | [1989/10] | English: | Plastic container inspection process | [1989/10] | French: | Processus d'inspection de conteneurs en plastique | [1989/10] | Examination procedure | 05.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/18] | 24.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.10.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.11.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 16.12.1992 | [2002/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2901625 (HERBERT FRIEDMAN, et al); | [A]US3321954 (BAILEY ROBERT L); | [A]US3489523 (CLARDY EDWIN K, et al); | [A]US4208372 (HUBER BERNHARD W [DE]); | [A]US4454095 (HOLT JOHN K [US]) |