EP0307170 - Sheet infeed mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.1994 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.07.1994 [1994/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/11] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nothmann, Gerhard W. 3760 Edgeview Drive Pasadena California 91107 / US | [1989/11] | Representative(s) | Hill, Cecilia Ann, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | Hill, Cecilia Ann, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1989/11] | Frain, Timothy John Rank Xerox Limited Patent Department 364 Euston Road London NW1 3BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 88308238.0 | 06.09.1988 | [1989/11] | Priority number, date | US19870093831 | 08.09.1987 Original published format: US 93831 | [1989/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0307170 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0307170 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0307170 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65H5/36, B65H5/12, B41F21/05 | [1989/11] | CPC: |
B41F21/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/11] | Title | German: | Einführungsmechanismus für Bögen | [1989/11] | English: | Sheet infeed mechanism | [1989/11] | French: | Mécanisme d'introduction des feuilles | [1989/11] | Examination procedure | 15.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/02] | 18.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2378523 (WORTHINGTON EMORY W); | [A]US2406205 (WARD DAVIDSON WILLIAM, et al); | [A]US4408866 (GUSTAFSON GARY B [US]); | [A]GB2120641 (RYOBI LTD); | [A]US4464042 (OMORI KAZUO [JP], et al); | [A]DE3513440 (SHARP KK [JP]) |