EP0308207 - Stacker with a yoke-type stripping device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.1990 [1990/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CURT G. JOA, INC. Crocker Avenue Sheboygan Falls Wisconsin 53085 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/12] | For all designated states CURT G. JOA, INC. Crocker Avenue Sheboygan Falls Wisconsin 53085 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirsch, John L. 542 Lynwood Drive Sheboygan Falls Wisconsin 53085 / US | 02 /
Wingender, Mark L. 1711 North 35th Street Sheboygan Wisconsin 53081 / US | [1989/12] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Bernard, et al Raworth, Moss & Cook 36 Sydenham Road Croydon Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/12] | Fisher, Bernard, et al Raworth, Moss & Cook 36 Sydenham Road Croydon Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 88308511.0 | 14.09.1988 | [1989/12] | Priority number, date | US19870095839 | 14.09.1987 Original published format: US 95839 | [1989/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0308207 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65H39/105, B65H29/54, B65B35/50 | [1989/12] | CPC: |
B65G47/082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1989/12] | Title | German: | Stapelvorrichtung mit einem jochartigen Abstreifer | [1989/12] | English: | Stacker with a yoke-type stripping device | [1989/12] | French: | Appareil d'empilage avec un préleveur de type joug | [1989/12] | File destroyed: | 27.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.09.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/19] | 12.12.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0151034 [ ] (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) |