EP0308222 - Point location determination at or close to the surface of the sea [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Horizon Exploration Limited 6 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | For all designated states HORIZON EXPLORATION LIMITED 6 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1989/12] | For all designated states Horizon Exploration Limited Horizon House Azalea Drive Swanley, Kent BR8 8JR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Norton, John Philemon Jr. Stratos S.A. Apartado 689 Alajuela / CR | 02 /
Court, Ian Nigel 44, Park Avenue Orpington Kent, BR6 9EH / GB | 03 /
Hall, Michael Anthony 29 Higham Lane Tonbridge Kent, TN10 4JD / GB | [1989/12] | Representative(s) | Abrams, Michael John, et al Haseltine Lake & Co, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/12] | Abrams, Michael John, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 88308538.3 | 15.09.1988 | [1989/12] | Priority number, date | GB19870021748 | 16.09.1987 Original published format: GB 8721748 | [1989/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0308222 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0308222 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0308222 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/18, G01V1/38 | [1989/12] | CPC: |
G01V1/3835 (EP,US);
G01S5/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/12] | Title | German: | Ermittlung der Position eines Punktes auf oder in der Nähe der Meeresoberfläche | [1989/12] | English: | Point location determination at or close to the surface of the sea | [1989/12] | French: | Détermination de la position d'un point sur ou proche de la surface de la mer | [1989/12] | Examination procedure | 05.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/31] | 18.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.10.1991 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   07.10.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 18.01.1995 | FR | 18.01.1995 | IT | 18.01.1995 | NL | 18.01.1995 | DE | 19.04.1995 | [2008/01] |
Former [2006/14] | ES | 18.01.1995 | |
FR | 18.01.1995 | ||
IT | 18.01.1995 | ||
NL | 18.01.1995 | ||
DE | 19.04.1995 | ||
Former [2002/24] | ES | 18.01.1995 | |
IT | 18.01.1995 | ||
NL | 18.01.1995 | ||
DE | 19.04.1995 | ||
FR | 16.06.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 18.01.1995 | |
NL | 18.01.1995 | ||
DE | 19.04.1995 | ||
FR | 16.06.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | NL | 18.01.1995 | |
DE | 19.04.1995 | ||
FR | 16.06.1995 | ||
Former [1995/41] | DE | 19.04.1995 | |
FR | 16.06.1995 | ||
Former [1995/40] | DE | 19.04.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4187492 (DELIGNIERES ROBERT [FR]); | [X]GB2089042 (CHEVRON RES); | [X]US4660185 (FRENCH WILLIAM S [US]); | [XP]US4709356 (AYERS RAY R [US]); | [XP]EP0267840 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) |