EP0309171 - A method for the production of a carbon electrode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.1993 [1993/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/13] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tajima, Yoshimitsu 637-1, Horensaho-cho Nara-shi Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Mohri, Motoo 1-6-19, Rokujonishi Nara-shi Nara-ken / JP | [1989/13] | Representative(s) | Taylor, Phillip Kenneth, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/13] | Taylor, Phillip Kenneth, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 88308628.2 | 16.09.1988 | [1989/13] | Priority number, date | JP19870235704 | 19.09.1987 Original published format: JP 23570487 | [1989/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0309171 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0309171 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/96, C23C16/26 | [1989/13] | CPC: |
H01M4/583 (EP,US);
C23C16/26 (EP,US);
H01M4/0428 (EP,US);
H01M4/1393 (EP,US);
H01M4/587 (EP,US);
H01M4/96 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Kohlenstoffelektrode | [1989/13] | English: | A method for the production of a carbon electrode | [1989/13] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'une électrode à base de carbone | [1989/13] | Examination procedure | 24.09.1988 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 16.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2402890 [ ] (DUCOMMUN INC); | US3944686 [ ] (FROBERG ROBERT W) |