EP0309232 - Optical information recording and reproducing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.01.1995 [1995/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/13] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Yoshio Akatsuki-Ryo 2613-1, Ichinomoto-cho Tenri-shi Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Ogata, Nobuo Akatsuki-Ryo 2613-1, Ichinomoto-cho Tenri-shi Nara-ken / JP | 03 /
Ishii, Mitsuo 32-75, Takada-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi Nara-ken / JP | 04 /
Kurata, Yukio 148-1, Kidono-cho Tenri-shi Nara-ken / JP | 05 /
Nakata, Yasuo 2613-1, Ichinomoto-cho Tenri-shi Nara-ken / JP | 06 /
Inoue, Teruaki deceased / JP | [1989/13] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/13] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88308773.6 | 21.09.1988 | [1989/13] | Priority number, date | JP19870236756 | 21.09.1987 Original published format: JP 23675687 | [1989/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0309232 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0309232 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0309232 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G11B11/10, G11B27/36 | [1989/13] | CPC: |
G11B11/10595 (EP,US);
G11B11/10504 (EP,US);
G11B11/10515 (EP,US);
G11B27/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/13] | Title | German: | Optisches Informationsaufzeichnungs und -wiedergabegerät | [1989/13] | English: | Optical information recording and reproducing apparatus | [1989/13] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement et de reproduction d'information optique | [1989/13] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1988 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 04.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6254857 ; | [A]US3731290 (AAGARD R) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 248 (P-604)(2695) 13 August 1987, & JP-A-62 54857 (CANON) 10 March 1987,, & JP6254857 A 19870310 | [A] - PHILIPS TECHNICAL REVIEW. vol. 42, no. 2, August 1985, EINDHOVEN NL pages 37 - 47; HARTMANN ET AL: "ERASABLE MAGNETO-OPTICAL RECORDING" |