EP0309271 - Selective herbicides able additionally to control lateral buds in tobacco plants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.1992 | Change - applicant | published on 03.06.1992 [1992/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHEVRON RESEARCH COMPANY 555 Market Street, P.O. Box 7141 San Francisco California 94120-7141 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | For all designated states CHEVRON RESEARCH COMPANY 555 Market Street, P.O. Box 7141 San Francisco, California 94120-7141 / US | ||
Former [1989/13] | For all designated states CHEVRON RESEARCH COMPANY 555 Market Street San Francisco California 94105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Loh, William 804, Sartori Drive Petaluma California 94952 / US | 02 /
Bassi, Pawan K. 432, Greenbrier Court Benicia California 94510 / US | [1989/13] | Representative(s) | Kosmin, Gerald Emmanuel, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/13] | Kosmin, Gerald Emmanuel, et al HASELTINE, LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 88308855.1 | 23.09.1988 | [1989/13] | Priority number, date | US19870101321 | 25.09.1987 Original published format: US 101321 | US19870101324 | 25.09.1987 Original published format: US 101324 | [1989/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0309271 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07D409/12, A01N43/18, // C07D335/02 | [1989/13] | CPC: |
C07D409/12 (EP,KR);
A01N43/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, GR, LI [1989/13] | Title | German: | Selektive Herbizide, auch geeignet zur Bekämpfung der Nebenableger in Tabakpflanzen | [1989/13] | English: | Selective herbicides able additionally to control lateral buds in tobacco plants | [1989/13] | French: | Herbicides sélectifs, capables également de maîtriser la pousse des surgeons latéraux dans les plantes à tabac | [1989/13] | File destroyed: | 02.07.1996 | Examination procedure | 29.03.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 12.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/32] | 18.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 31.01.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US4624696 (KEIL MICHAEL [DE], et al); | [YD]US4432786 (LOH WILLIAM [US]) |