EP0309297 - Therapeutic peptides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1995 [1995/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Administrators of The Tulane Educational Fund 1430 Tulane Avenue New Orleans Louisiana 70112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/13] | For all designated states The Administrators of The Tulane Educational Fund 1430 Tulane Avenue New Orleans Louisiana 70112 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coy, David H. 4319 Perrier Street New Orleans Louisiana 70115 / US | 02 /
Moreau, Jacques-Pierre 159 Westboro Road Upton Massachusetts 05168 / US | [1989/13] | Representative(s) | Deans, Michael John Percy, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/13] | Deans, Michael John Percy, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R OAE / GB | Application number, filing date | 88308916.1 | 26.09.1988 | [1989/13] | Priority number, date | US19870100571 | 24.09.1987 Original published format: US 100571 | [1989/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0309297 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0309297 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0309297 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/00, A61K37/02, C07K7/02 | [1990/25] | CPC: |
C07K7/086 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K7/02 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/13] | C07K7/00, A61K37/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/13] | Title | German: | Therapeutische Peptide | [1989/13] | English: | Therapeutic peptides | [1989/13] | French: | Peptides à activité thérapeutique | [1989/13] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 14.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/02] | 23.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 24.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4207311 (BROWN MARVIN R [US], et al) | [X] - NATURE, vol. 316, 29th August 1985, pages 823-826, Mac Millan Journals, Basingstoke, GB; F. CUTTITTA et al.: "Bombesin-like peptides can function in human small-cell lung cancer" | [X] - AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY, vol. 252, 1987, pages G439 - G442; P. HEINZ-ERIAN et al.: "[D-Phe12]bombesin analogues: a new class of bombesin receptor antagonists" | [XP] - JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 263, 1988, pages 5056-5060, Baltimore, US; D.H. COY et al.: "Probing peptide backbone function in bombesin" | Examination | - Sasaki et al., J. Med. Chem. (1987), 30, 1162-1166. | - Martiner et al., J. Med. Chem. (1985), 28, 1874-1879. |