EP0311381 - Substituted polyvinyl acetal resin, use thereof as an adhesion promoting additive, method of producing same and adhesive composition comprising same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.1990 [1990/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LOCTITE (IRELAND) Ltd. Whitestown Industrial Estate Tallaght, Co. Dublin 24 / IE | [1989/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harris, Stephen 10, Broadford Crescent Ballinteer Dublin 16 / IE | [1989/15] | Representative(s) | Marchant, James Ian, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | Marchant, James Ian, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1989/15] | Marchant, James Ian Elkington & Fife Beacon House 113 Kingsway London WC2B 6PP / GB | Application number, filing date | 88309289.2 | 06.10.1988 | [1989/15] | Priority number, date | IE19870002674 | 07.10.1987 Original published format: IE 267487 | [1989/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0311381 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0311381 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/14, C09J3/14 | [1989/15] | CPC: |
C08F8/14 (EP,US);
C08F2810/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/15] | Title | German: | Substituiertes Polyvinylacetalharz, Verwendung davon als Adhäsionsverbesserer, Verfahren zur Herstellung davon und dieses Harz enthaltende Klebstoffzusammensetzung | [1989/15] | English: | Substituted polyvinyl acetal resin, use thereof as an adhesion promoting additive, method of producing same and adhesive composition comprising same | [1989/15] | French: | Résine d'acétal polyvinylique substitué, application comme accélérateur d'adhésion, son procédé de préparation et composition adhésive contenant la résine | [1989/15] | File destroyed: | 29.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.12.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/33] | 26.03.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5452195 ; | [A]JPS5670001 ; | [A]JPS5667308 ; | [A]DE2138858 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND); | [A]GB2144749 (PLASTOMEDICAL SCIENCES INC) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 91, no. 14, 1st October 1979, page 30, abstract no. 108645g, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-79 52 195 (KANEBOLTD) 24-04-1979 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 136 (C-69)[808]28th August 1981; & JP-A-56 70 001 (SEKISUI KAGAKU KOGYO K.K.) 11-06-1981 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 132 (C-68)[804]22nd August 1981; & JP-A-56 67 308 (SEKISUI KAGAKU KOGYO K.K.) 06-06-1981 |