EP0362445 - Electrical conditioning system for electrodes in an electrolysis cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DYNAMOTIVE ELECTROCHEM CORPORATION 3760 Wesbrook Mall Vancouver British Columbia V6S 2L2 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | For all designated states DYNAMOTIVE ELECTROCHEM CORPORATION 3760 Wesbrook Mall Vancouver British Columbia V6S 2L2 / CA | ||
Former [1990/15] | For all designated states H.P.G. RESEARCH LTD. 405 West 23rd Street Vancouver, B.C. V5Y 2H5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Timewell Richard R. 405 W. 23rd St. Vancouver B.C. V5Y 2H5 / CA | [1990/15] | Representative(s) | Smith, Norman Ian, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/15] | Smith, Norman Ian, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88309321.3 | 06.10.1988 | [1990/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0362445 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0362445 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C25B1/04, C25B15/00, C25D11/04, C25F1/00, C25F3/00, C23F13/02, H01M10/42 | [1990/15] | CPC: |
C25B11/00 (EP,US);
C25B15/025 (KR);
C25B1/04 (EP,KR,US);
C25B11/046 (KR);
C25B15/08 (KR);
C25B9/65 (KR);
C25F1/00 (EP,US);
H01M10/42 (EP,US);
H01M8/0656 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/15] | Title | German: | Elektrische Konditionierungssystem für Elektroden in einer Elektrolysezelle | [1990/15] | English: | Electrical conditioning system for electrodes in an electrolysis cell | [1990/15] | French: | Système de conditionnement éléctrique pour électrodes dans une cellule d'électrolyse | [1990/15] | Examination procedure | 12.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/46] | 25.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.05.1994 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/33] | Request for further processing for: | 20.09.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 20.09.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.12.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 23.08.1995 | GR | 23.08.1995 | NL | 23.08.1995 | LU | 31.10.1995 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/24] | CH | 23.08.1995 | |
ES | 23.08.1995 | ||
GR | 23.08.1995 | ||
LI | 23.08.1995 | ||
LU | 31.10.1995 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 23.08.1995 | |
GR | 23.08.1995 | ||
LI | 23.08.1995 | ||
LU | 31.10.1995 | ||
Former [2000/50] | GR | 23.08.1995 | |
CH | 24.10.1995 | ||
LI | 24.10.1995 | ||
LU | 31.10.1995 | ||
Former [2000/04] | GR | 23.08.1995 | |
LU | 31.10.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | US4372828 [ ] (AHN BYUNG K) | Examination | - Heitz-Kreysa "Grundlagen der technischen Elektrochemie", p. 213 Verlagchemie 1977 | - Power Sources 8 1991 p. 523-534 |