EP0312293 - Sensing device for analysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states O.C.T. OPTICAL CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED POB 135 Industrial Zone Yokneam / IL | [1992/52] |
Former [1989/16] | For all designated states THE ISRAEL CERAMIC & SILICATE INSTITUTE Technion City Haifa / IL | ||
For all designated states O.C.T. OPTICAL CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED 275 Reuven Street Neve Habaron Zichron Yaakov / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kritzman, Amnon 23 Hamada Street Zichron Yaakov / IL | 02 /
Falkenstein, Elliezer 33 Trumpeldor Street Zichron Yaakov / IL | 03 /
Ish-Shalom, Moshe 11 Oren Street Haifa / IL | 04 /
Buch, Alla 10/6 Cabri Street Kiryat Haim Haifa / IL | 05 /
Beer, Menuha 2 Harel Street Haifa / IL | [1989/16] | Representative(s) | Geering, Keith Edwin, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/16] | Geering, Keith Edwin, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 88309486.4 | 11.10.1988 | [1989/16] | Priority number, date | IL19810000841 | 16.10.1987 Original published format: IL 84181 | IL19820000841 | 16.10.1987 Original published format: IL 84182 | IL19310000845 | 19.11.1987 Original published format: IL 84531 | IL19330000845 | 19.11.1987 Original published format: IL 84533 | [1989/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0312293 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0312293 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, G01N21/64, G01N21/77 | [1989/16] | CPC: |
G01N21/643 (EP,US);
A61B5/1459 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6434 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/16] | Title | German: | Fühlervorrichtung für die Analyse | [1989/16] | English: | Sensing device for analysis | [1989/16] | French: | Dispositif capteur pour analyse | [1989/16] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 13.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/45] | 08.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/08] | 19.09.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/08] | Request for further processing for: | 27.07.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 27.07.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.08.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0072627 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [X]EP0205232 (KELSIUS INC [US]) | [Y] - ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY. vol. 56, no. 1, 1 January 1984, pages 16A-34A; W.R. SEITZ: "Chemical Sensors Based on Fiber Optics". | [Y] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING. vol. BME-33, no. 2, February 1986, pages 117-132, New York, USA; J.L. GEHRICH et al.: "Optical Fluorescence and Its Application to an Intravascular Blood Gas Monitoring System". | [A] - SENSORS AND ACTUATORS. vol. 9, no. 1, February 1986, pages 73-84, Lausanne, CH; H. OFFENBACH et al.: "Fluorescence optical sensors for continuous determination of near-neutral pH values". |