EP0312358 - Method for promoting intramolecular disulfide bond formation in recombinant proteins contained in a denaturant solution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.1995 [1995/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MALLINCKRODT VETERINARY, INC. 421 East Hawley Street Mundelein Illinois 60060 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | For all designated states MALLINCKRODT VETERINARY, INC. 421 East Hawley Street Mundelein, Illinois 60060 / US | ||
Former [1994/29] | For all designated states Mallinckrodt Veterinary, Inc. 421 East Hawley Street Mundelein Illinois 60060 / US | ||
Former [1993/51] | For all designated states PITMAN-MOORE, INC. 421 East Hawley Street Mundelein, IL 60060 / US | ||
Former [1989/16] | For all designated states PITMAN-MOORE, INC. P.O. Box 207 1401 South Third Street Terre Haute Indiana 47808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seely, James E. R.R. 25, 7389 Troy Court Terre Haute Indiana 47802 / US | 02 /
Yang, Ren-der 4691 Springfield Place Terre Haute Indiana 47808 / US | [1989/16] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Michael John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/16] | Holmes, Michael John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88309604.2 | 13.10.1988 | [1989/16] | Priority number, date | US19870108433 | 14.10.1987 Original published format: US 108433 | [1989/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0312358 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0312358 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07K3/08, C12P21/02 | [1989/16] | CPC: |
C07K1/1133 (EP);
C07K14/61 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/16] | Title | German: | Methode zur Herstellung intramolekularer Disulfidbrücken in rekombinanten Proteinen in Gegenwart eines Denaturierungsmittels | [1989/16] | English: | Method for promoting intramolecular disulfide bond formation in recombinant proteins contained in a denaturant solution | [1989/16] | French: | Méthode pour la promotion de la formation des ponts disulfures dans les protéines recombinantes contenues dans des solutions dénaturantes | [1989/16] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 01.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/48] | 04.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 16.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/17] | 30.11.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1995/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0192629 (MONSANTO CO [US]); | [Y]WO8700204 (UPJOHN CO [US]); | [A]WO8702985 (BEATRICE CO INC [US]) | [Y] - METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, vol. 107, pages 305-329, Academic Press, Inc, New York/London; T.E. CREIGHTON: "Disulfide bond formation in proteins" | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 69, 1968, page 1644, abstract no. 17606z, Columbus, Ohio, US; J. LESLIE et al.: "The oxidation of beta-lactoglobulin in sodium dodecyl sulfate solutions", & CAN. J. BIOCHEM. 1968, 46(6), 625-7 | [A] - THE PROTEINS, vol. III, pages 239-55; H. NEURATH & R.L. HILL & T.-Y. LIU: "The role of sulfur in proteins" |