EP0312376 - Polyurea membrane and its use for aromatics/non-aromatics separations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.1991 [1991/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/16] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schucker, Robert Charles 10821 Goodwood Boulevard Baton Rouge Louisiana 70815 / US | [1989/16] | Representative(s) | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 12 Esso House, Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/16] | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 72 Esso House Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | Application number, filing date | 88309633.1 | 14.10.1988 | [1989/16] | Priority number, date | US19870108818 | 14.10.1987 Original published format: US 108818 | US19880237046 | 30.08.1988 Original published format: US 237046 | [1989/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0312376 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0312376 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01D13/04, C07C7/144, C10G31/11 | [1990/06] | CPC: |
B01D61/362 (EP,US);
B01D61/246 (EP,US);
B01D69/12 (EP);
B01D71/54 (EP);
C08G18/281 (EP);
C08G18/3225 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1989/16] | B01D13/00, B01D13/04 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/16] | Title | German: | Membran aus Polyharnstoff und ihre Verwendung zur Trennung aromatischer und nicht-aromatischer Kohlenwasserstoffe | [1989/16] | English: | Polyurea membrane and its use for aromatics/non-aromatics separations | [1989/16] | French: | Membrane de polyurée et son utilisation pour la séparation d'hydrocarbures aromatiques et non aromatiques | [1989/16] | File destroyed: | 04.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 01.08.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/12] | 24.10.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5896456 ; | [A]US2970106 (BINNING ROBERT C, et al); | [A]US3776970 (STRAZIK W, et al); | [A]DE2431071 (BAYER AG); | [AD]US4115465 (ELFERT KLAUS, et al) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 98, no. 24, 13 June 1983, page 21, column 2, abstract no. 199058b, Columbus, Ohio, USA; S.F. JOSHI et al.: "Studies on polyurea membrane"; & J. Appl. Polym. Sci. 1983, vol. 28, no. 4pages 1457-1463 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 81, no. 6, 12 august 1974, page 52, column 2, abstract no. 26611x, Columbus, OhioUSA; & JP-A-58 096 456 (TEIJIN LTD.) 10.12.1973 |