EP0314382 - Six speed manual transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.1991 [1991/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borg-Warner Automotive, Inc. 3001 West Big Beaver Road Troy Michigan 48084 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/18] | For all designated states Borg-Warner Automotive, Inc. 3001 West Big Beaver Road Troy Michigan 48084 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnson, Charles Ellis, Jr. 2712 W Twickingham Muncie Indiana 47304 / US | [1989/18] | Representative(s) | Williams, Trevor John, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5EU / GB | [1989/18] | Application number, filing date | 88309810.5 | 19.10.1988 | [1989/18] | Priority number, date | US19870114181 | 28.10.1987 Original published format: US 114181 | [1989/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0314382 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0314382 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16H3/08 | [1989/18] | CPC: |
F16H3/0915 (EP);
F16H2200/0052 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/18] | Title | German: | Sechsganghandschaltgetriebe | [1989/18] | English: | Six speed manual transmission | [1989/18] | French: | Boîte de vitesses à six rapports et à commande manuelle | [1989/18] | File destroyed: | 04.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 24.09.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/20] | 19.12.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.10.1990 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1051500 ; | [Y]GB2018371 ; | [Y]US4766773 ; | [YD]US3916712 |