EP0313334 - Magneto-optic recording medium and method of magneto-optic recording using the same medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Maxell Ltd. No 1-1-88, Ushitora Ibaraki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1989/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakemoto, Akito 4-6, Nishinodai Yawaramura Tsukuba-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Shimazaki, Katsusuke 1468-5, Furumagi Ishigemachi Yuki-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Tsuburaya, Yoshitane 1-2-2-401, Togashira Toride-shi / JP | [1989/17] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 88309812.1 | 19.10.1988 | [1989/17] | Priority number, date | JP19870262763 | 20.10.1987 Original published format: JP 26276387 | JP19870282954 | 11.11.1987 Original published format: JP 28295487 | [1989/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0313334 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0313334 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G11B11/10, G11B5/66, G11B5/84 | [1990/29] | CPC: |
G11B11/10586 (EP);
G11B11/10504 (EP);
G11B13/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/17] | G11B5/64, G11B11/10, G11B5/84 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1989/17] | Title | German: | Magnetooptischer Aufzeichnungsträger und Verfahren zur magnetooptischen Aufzeichnung mit demselben Träger | [1989/17] | English: | Magneto-optic recording medium and method of magneto-optic recording using the same medium | [1989/17] | French: | Milieu d'enregistrement magnéto-optique et méthode pour l'enregistrement magnéto-optique utilisant le même milieu | [1989/17] | Examination procedure | 08.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 06.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 03.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 03.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/23] | 12.01.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/23] | Appeal following examination | 08.04.1993 | Appeal received No. T0647/93 | 18.06.1993 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.04.1994 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Request for further processing for: | 22.12.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.01.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1995 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2162008 ; | [A]EP0225141 |