EP0313343 - Method of purifying protein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Corporation 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, NJ 07033 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | For all designated states SCHERING CORPORATION 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth New Jersey 07033 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naveh, David 16 South Mountain Road Millburn New Jersey 07041 / US | 02 /
Tang, John Chu-Tay 19 Camelot Drive Livingston New Jersey 07039 / US | [1989/17] | Representative(s) | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 88309824.6 | 19.10.1988 | [1989/17] | Priority number, date | US19870111886 | 23.10.1987 Original published format: US 111886 | [1989/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0313343 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0313343 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0313343 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/18, C12N15/27, B01J39/06 | [1995/16] | CPC: |
C07K14/535 (EP);
B01J39/26 (EP);
C07K1/18 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/17] | C07K3/22, C12P21/02, B01J39/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/24] |
Former [1989/17] | ES, GR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Proteinreinigung | [1989/17] | English: | Method of purifying protein | [1989/17] | French: | Procédé de purification de protéines | [1989/17] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1991/38: Verbunden mit 88909648.3/0391934 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 07.08.91 | EPB 1991/38: Consolidated with 88909648.3/0391934 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 07.08.91 | EPB 1991/38: Jointe à la demande no. 88909648.3/0391934 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 07.08.91 | Examination procedure | 19.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/50] | 20.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.01.1996
24.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH D-55216 Ingelheim / DE | [1996/10] | 04.03.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.07.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.10.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.11.1997 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.11.1997 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 10.10.2002 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.11.2002 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 19.05.2003 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 20.01.1998 | Appeal received No. T0150/98 | 26.03.1998 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.10.2002 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 10.10.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.10.2002 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 20.09.2000 | AT | 19.10.2000 | LU | 19.10.2000 | GR | 31.10.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/28] | SE | 20.09.2000 | |
AT | 19.10.2000 | ||
GR | 31.10.2000 | ||
Former [2004/09] | AT | 19.10.2000 | |
GR | 31.10.2000 | ||
Former [2003/19] | AT | 19.10.2000 | |
GR | 09.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/10] | AT | 19.10.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0176299 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]); | [Y]US4658018 (URDAL DAVID L [US], et al); | [YP]EP0254399 (IMMUNOLOGY VENTURES [US]) | [X] - BIOCHEM. JOURNAL, vol. 240, pages 1-12, GB; F.A.O. MARSTON: "The purification of eukaryotic polypeptides synthesized in Escherichia coli" | [Y] - LE TECHNOSCOPE DE BIOFUTUR, no. 12, July/August 1987, pages 4-6, Supplement, Paris, FR; "La chromatographie préparative basse pression" | [X] - IMMUNOLOGICAL REV., vol. 63, 1982, pages 166-209; S. GILLIS et al.: "Molecular characterization of interleukin 2" | [Y] - BIOCHEMISTRY, second edition, 1981, page 19, W.H. Freeman and Co., New York, US |