EP0313360 - High strength pigments for printing inks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1993 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.1993 [1993/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION 222 Bridge Plaza South Fort Lee New Jersey / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | For all designated states SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION 222 Bridge Plaza South Fort Lee New Jersey / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anantharaman, K. R. 12150 Brookston Drive Cincinnati Ohio / US | 02 /
Soward, Susan T. 1915 Stevens Avenue Cincinnati Ohio / US | 03 /
Smoot, Wilmeth M. RR No. 1 Box 122C Crittenden Kentucky / US | [1989/17] | Representative(s) | Jones, Helen M.M., et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | Jones, Helen Marjorie Meredith, et al Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 88309879.0 | 20.10.1988 | [1989/17] | Priority number, date | US19870112824 | 23.10.1987 Original published format: US 112824 | [1989/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0313360 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0313360 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/00, C09D11/00 | [1989/17] | CPC: |
C09D11/037 (EP,US);
C09B67/001 (EP,US);
C09F1/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/17] | Title | German: | Pigment von hoher Stärke zur Verwendung in Drucktinten | [1992/31] | English: | High strength pigments for printing inks | [1989/17] | French: | Pigment à haute chromaticité pour encres d'imprimerie | [1992/31] |
Former [1989/17] | Pigment von hoher Brillanz und Stärke zur Verwendung für Druckerschwärze | ||
Former [1989/17] | Pigment à haute chromaticité et brillance pour encres d'imprimerie | Examination procedure | 12.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/49] | 05.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1246922 (CFMC); | [X]US4327017 (IWAMOTO SEIGO, et al) | Examination | - KIRK-OTHMER, Vol. 20, p. 197-199 3rd. Edition |