EP0313402 - Method for culturing plant tissue [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.1993 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | For all designated states MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shizufumi, Tanimoto 2-6, Misono 1-chome Otake-shi Hiroshima, 739-06 / JP | 02 /
Shigeru, Takahashi 2-7, Misono 1-chome Otake-shi Hiroshima, 739-06 / JP | [1989/17] | Representative(s) | Myerscough, Philip Boyd, et al J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [1989/17] | Application number, filing date | 88309952.5 | 21.10.1988 | [1989/17] | Priority number, date | JP19870266519 | 23.10.1987 Original published format: JP 26651987 | [1989/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0313402 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0313402 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A01G7/00 | [1989/17] | CPC: |
A01H4/005 (EP);
C12N5/04 (KR);
A01H4/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Kultur von Pflanzengewebe | [1989/17] | English: | Method for culturing plant tissue | [1989/17] | French: | Méthode de culture de tissu de plantes | [1989/17] | Examination procedure | 10.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/36] | 27.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.05.1992 | CH | 20.05.1992 | ES | 20.05.1992 | GR | 20.05.1992 | LI | 20.05.1992 | SE | 20.05.1992 | LU | 31.10.1992 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 20.05.1992 | |
CH | 20.05.1992 | ||
GR | 20.05.1992 | ||
LI | 20.05.1992 | ||
SE | 20.05.1992 | ||
LU | 31.10.1992 | ||
Former [1999/52] | AT | 20.05.1992 | |
CH | 20.05.1992 | ||
LI | 20.05.1992 | ||
SE | 20.05.1992 | ||
LU | 31.10.1992 | ||
Former [1993/03] | AT | 20.05.1992 | |
CH | 20.05.1992 | ||
LI | 20.05.1992 | ||
SE | 20.05.1992 | ||
Former [1992/52] | CH | 20.05.1992 | |
LI | 20.05.1992 | ||
SE | 20.05.1992 | ||
Former [1992/49] | CH | 20.05.1992 | |
LI | 20.05.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8702701 (PLANT GENETICS INC [US]); | [XP]EP0276575 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [XP]EP0281374 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) |