Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE101297T | 15.02.1994 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US11553687 | 30.10.1987 | EP88310202 | 31.10.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG40894G | 28.10.1994 | G | Priority number | Date | SG40894 | 22.03.1994 | US11553687 | 30.10.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2446488 | Global Dossier | 04.05.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US11553687 | 30.10.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0314515 | Global Dossier | 02.02.1994 | B1 | EP0314515 | 12.12.1990 | A3 | EP0314515 | 03.05.1989 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US11553687 | 30.10.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3887632T | 11.05.1994 | T2 | DE3887632D1 | 17.03.1994 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US11553687 | 30.10.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK103094 | 07.10.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US11553687 | 30.10.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2716101B | 18.02.1998 | B2 | JPH01237970 | 22.09.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US11553687 | 30.10.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR970002864B | 12.03.1997 | B1 | KR890007278 | 19.06.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US11553687 | 30.10.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4845579 | 04.07.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US11553687 | 30.10.1987 |