EP0316151 - Overhead traveling crane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/20] | Guidance means for an extendable beam of an overhead traveling crane | ||
[1992/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.1993 [1993/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA SHINWA GIKEN 61 Usazaki-Minami 2 chome Shirahama-cho Himeji / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/20] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA SHINWA GIKEN 61 Usazaki-Minami 2 chome Shirahama-cho Himeji / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takada, Shigetoshi 61 Usazaki-Minami 2 chome Shirahama-cho Himeji / JP | [1989/20] | Representative(s) | Arthur, Bryan Edward, et al Withers & Rogers Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/20] | Arthur, Bryan Edward, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 88310543.9 | 09.11.1988 | [1989/20] | Priority number, date | JP19870171190 | 09.11.1987 Original published format: JP 17119087 | [1989/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0316151 | Date: | 17.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0316151 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/07 | [1989/20] | CPC: |
B66F9/07 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/20] | Title | German: | Hochliegender Laufkran | [1992/15] | English: | Overhead traveling crane | [1992/15] | French: | Grue mobile aérienne | [1992/15] |
Former [1989/20] | Führungsmittel für einen ausziehbaren Mast eines hochliegenden Laufkrans | ||
Former [1989/20] | Guidance means for an extendable beam of an overhead traveling crane | ||
Former [1989/20] | Moyens de guidage pour un mât extensible d'une grue mobile aérienne | Examination procedure | 14.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/02] | 13.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3528996 ; | [Y]US3109545 ; | [A]GB782070 ; | [A]FR1415329 ; | [A]US3082881 ; | [A]DE3149411 ; | [A]FR1527526 ; | [A]US3095945 |