EP0317224 - Focus detection system for an optical disk drive using photo sensor elements in the far field of information pits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1994 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishibashi, Hiromichi 14-28, 6-chome Toneyama Toyonaka-shi Osaka-fu, 560 / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Shinichi C-403, 10-1, Fukakusahotta-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu, 612 / JP | 03 /
Matsubara, Akira Tsukumo MS 11-go 2-26-9, Syowadai-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka-fu, 569 / JP | 04 /
Okada, Tsuyoshi Saedo-ryo, 746-1 Saedo-cho Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken 226 / JP | [1989/21] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 88310704.7 | 14.11.1988 | [1989/21] | Priority number, date | JP19870290030 | 17.11.1987 Original published format: JP 29003087 | JP19870290031 | 17.11.1987 Original published format: JP 29003187 | JP19880216571 | 31.08.1988 Original published format: JP 21657188 | [1989/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0317224 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0317224 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0317224 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/09, G11B7/095 | [1989/21] | CPC: |
G11B7/0908 (EP,US);
G11B7/09 (KR);
G11B7/0917 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/21] | Title | German: | Fokusregelsystem für optische Scheibenvorrichtung mit lichtempfindlichen Elementen in der Fokusebene des Bildes der Informationsstruktur | [1989/21] | English: | Focus detection system for an optical disk drive using photo sensor elements in the far field of information pits | [1989/21] | French: | Système de mise au point pour appareil de disque optique avec des éléments photosensibles dans le plan focal de l'image de la structure d'informations | [1989/21] | Examination procedure | 22.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/17] | 09.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP60214429 ; | [A]JP55101142 ; | [A]JP57183639 ; | JP57183639 [ ]; | [XP]GB2196115 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP); | [A]FR2302646 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [AD]US4051527 (BRAAT JOSEPHUS JOHANNES MARIA); | [A]GB2059664 (SONY CORP) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 76 (P-440)(2133) 26 March 1986, & JP-A-60 214429 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K) 26 October 1985,, & JP60214429 A 19851026 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 4, no. 153 (P-33)(635) 25 October 1980, & JP-A-55 101142 (TEAC K.K.) 01 August 1980,, & JP55101142 A 19800801 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 32 (P-174)(1177) 08 February 1983, & JP-A-57 183639 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K) 12 November 1982,, & JP57183639 A 19821112 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 32 (P-174)(1177) 08 February 1983, & JP-A-57 183639 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K) 12 November 1982,, & JP57183639 A 19821112 |