EP0319161 - Connector for wiper blades [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.09.1992 [1992/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Champion Spark Plug Italiana S.p.A. Via Venaria, 13 10040 Druento (TO) / IT | [1989/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scorsiroli, Marcello Via Filadelfia, 204 I-10137 Torino / IT | [1989/23] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/23] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 88310789.8 | 15.11.1988 | [1989/23] | Priority number, date | IT19870068016 | 26.11.1987 Original published format: IT 6801687 | [1989/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0319161 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0319161 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/40 | [1989/23] | CPC: |
B60S1/4003 (EP,US);
B60S1/34 (KR);
B60S1/02 (KR);
B60S1/4009 (EP,US);
B60S1/4087 (EP,US);
B60S2001/409 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB [1989/23] | Title | German: | Wischerblätter-Verbindungsstück | [1989/23] | English: | Connector for wiper blades | [1989/23] | French: | Connecteur pour balais d'essuyage | [1989/23] | Examination procedure | 15.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/03] | 25.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2081075 (TRICO FOLBERTH LTD) |