Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] |
07.01.1994 | (Expected) grant | published on 23.02.1994 [1994/08] |
01.07.1992 | First examination report | |
22.02.1990 | Publication of search report | published on 11.04.1990 [1990/15] |
08.04.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.05.1989 [1989/21] |
08.04.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.05.1989 [1989/21] |