EP0317297 - Tape cassette [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1994 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ozawa, Kazuo c/o Sony Magnetic Products Inc. 5-6 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/21] | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 88310828.4 | 16.11.1988 | [1989/21] | Priority number, date | JP19870294783 | 20.11.1987 Original published format: JP 29478387 | [1989/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0317297 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0317297 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0317297 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/087 | [1989/21] | CPC: |
G11B23/08721 (EP,US);
G11B23/087 (KR);
G11B23/08757 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/21] | Title | German: | Bandkassette | [1989/21] | English: | Tape cassette | [1989/21] | French: | Cassette à bande | [1989/21] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/21] | 06.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2033503 ; | [A]DE8516472U ; | [A]DE3511227 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0190908 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]GB2176170 (TDK CORP [JP]) |