EP0317359 - Modified polyolefin resin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1994 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.1994 [1994/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED Kitahama 4-chome 5-33 Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toyoshima, Yoshiki 832-4 Shiizu Ichihara-shi / JP | 02 /
Okada, Mitsuyuki 9 Yushudainishi-1-chome Ichihara-shi / JP | 03 /
Fujii, Takeshi 2848-19 Kubota Sodegauramachi Kimitsu-gun Chiba-ken / JP | 04 /
Yamaguchi, Kentaro 9 Yushudainishi-1-chome Ichihara-shi / JP | 05 /
Tsuji, Mitsuji 9 Yushudainishi-1-chome Ichihara-shi / JP | 06 /
Shinonaga, Hideo 285-172 Higashiterayamacho Chiba-shi / JP | [1989/21] | Representative(s) | Ablewhite, Alan James, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | Ablewhite, Alan James, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 88310947.2 | 21.11.1988 | [1989/21] | Priority number, date | JP19870294750 | 20.11.1987 Original published format: JP 29475087 | [1989/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0317359 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0317359 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0317359 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08F255/00, C08F287/00, C08F291/02, C08J7/04 | [1989/21] | CPC: |
C08F255/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/02 (KR);
C08F255/02 (EP,KR);
C08F255/04 (EP,KR);
C08F287/00 (EP,US);
C08F291/02 (EP,US);
C08J7/0427 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08L51/04 (KR);
C08J2351/00 (EP,US);
C08J2475/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31573 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31587 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F255/02, C08F220/325, C08F212/08 (US,KR,EP);
C08F255/04, C08F220/325, C08F212/08 (US,KR,EP);
C08F291/02, C08F222/06 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/21] | Title | German: | Modifiziertes Polyolefinharz | [1989/21] | English: | Modified polyolefin resin | [1989/21] | French: | Résine de polyoléfine modifiée | [1989/21] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/50] | 13.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2023154 (MITSUI POLYCHEMICALS LTD); | [Y]DE1939894 (BAYER AG) |