EP0325032 - Method for separating nucleic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.07.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.1992 | Refusal of application | published on 09.09.1992 [1992/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/30] | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iino, Shinji 4-8-17, Sakomachi Hikoshima Shimonoseki-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 02 /
Ishigaki, Kyoichi 6-2-45, Sakomachi Hikoshima Shimonoseki-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Kumiko A-201, Fuji Haitsu 819-1, Nabekurahigashi Konan-ku Ube-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | [1989/30] | Representative(s) | Harvey, David Gareth, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/30] | Harvey, David Gareth, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 88310975.3 | 21.11.1988 | [1989/30] | Priority number, date | JP19870293267 | 20.11.1987 Original published format: JP 29326787 | [1989/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0325032 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01D15/00, C12Q1/68 | [1989/30] | CPC: |
C12N15/101 (EP);
B01D15/3847 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1989/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Trennung von Nukleinsäuren | [1989/30] | English: | Method for separating nucleic acid | [1989/30] | French: | Méthode pour la séparation d'acides nucléiques | [1989/30] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/11] | 19.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.03.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1992/37] | 12.03.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1992/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA | [A] - J. BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY |