EP0329895 - Hanger and seal assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.1995 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.1995 [1995/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cooper Industries, Inc. 1001 Fannin, Suite 4000 Houston Texas 77002 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/19] | For all designated states Cooper Industries Inc. 1001 Fannin, Suite 4000 Houston Texas 77002 / US | ||
Former [1989/44] | For all designated states Cameron Iron Works USA, Inc. (a Delaware corp.) 13013 Northwest Freeway Houston, Texas 77040 / US | ||
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states CAMERON IRON WORKS USA, INC. 13013 Northwest Freeway Houston Texas 77040 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McEver, James P. Hareness Road Altens Industrial Estate Nigg Aberdeen Scotland / GB | 02 /
Theiss, David H. 15106 Lakeview Houston Texas 77040 / US | [1989/35] | Representative(s) | Smith, Norman Ian, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | Smith, Norman Ian, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88311102.3 | 24.11.1988 | [1989/35] | Priority number, date | US19880159946 | 24.02.1988 Original published format: US 159946 | [1989/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0329895 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0329895 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0329895 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E21B33/043, F16J15/10 | [1989/35] | CPC: |
E21B33/043 (EP,US);
E21B2200/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/35] | Title | German: | Aufhänge- und Abdicht-Einrichtung | [1989/35] | English: | Hanger and seal assembly | [1989/35] | French: | Dispositif de suspension et d'étanchéité | [1989/35] | Examination procedure | 03.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/48] | 29.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/28] | Request for further processing for: | 14.07.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 14.07.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.08.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3614868 (DRIL QUIP INC [US]); | [A]US4719971 (OWENS HENRY S [US]) |