EP0325035 - Liquid crystal compound and method of manufacturing the same, liquid crystal composition containing the same and liquid crystal display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/30] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takatoh, Kohki c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Sakamoto, Masanori c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 03 /
Sunohara, Kazuyuki c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1989/30] | Representative(s) | Freed, Arthur Woolf, et al Marks & Clerk Incorporating Edward Evans Barker 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/30] | Freed, Arthur Woolf, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 88311135.3 | 24.11.1988 | [1989/30] | Priority number, date | JP19880009616 | 21.01.1988 Original published format: JP 961688 | [1989/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0325035 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0325035 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0325035 | Date: | 18.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C69/753, C07C69/76, C09K19/32 | [1989/30] | CPC: |
C09K19/32 (EP,US);
C09K19/00 (KR);
C07C69/73 (KR);
C07C69/76 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1989/30] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristall-Verbindung und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung, dieselbe enthaltende Flüssigkristallzusammensetzung und Flüssigkristall-Anzeigevorrichtung | [1989/30] | English: | Liquid crystal compound and method of manufacturing the same, liquid crystal composition containing the same and liquid crystal display device | [1989/30] | French: | Composé liquide cristallin et procéde pour le préparer, composition de cristaux liquides le contenant et dispositif à affichage par cristaux liquides | [1989/30] | Examination procedure | 07.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/30] | 18.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 18.08.1993 | FR | 18.08.1993 | LI | 18.08.1993 | NL | 18.08.1993 | [2004/35] |
Former [1994/45] | CH | 18.08.1993 | |
LI | 18.08.1993 | ||
NL | 18.08.1993 | ||
FR | 14.01.1994 | ||
Former [1994/05] | CH | 18.08.1993 | |
LI | 18.08.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0113293 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [E]JPS63291981 (TOSHIBA CORP) | [Y] - MOLECULAR CRYSTALS AND LIQUID CRYSTALS, vol. 129, no. 1/3, 1985, pages 17-35, Gordon and Breach, Science Publishers, Inc., London, GB; I.R. DAVISON et al.: "Fluorene analogues of biphenyls: Comparison of mesogenic behaviour" | [XP] - MOLECULAR CRYSTALS & LIQUID CRYSTALS, vol. 164, November 1988, pages 167-178, Gordon and Breach Science Publishers S.A., Montreux, CH; K. TAKATOH et al.: "Mesophase transition of series materials containing fluorene, fluorenone and biphenyl structures with chiral end groups" |