EP0322116 - Interconnect system for multiprocessor structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 2550 Garcia Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [1999/11] |
Former [1989/26] | For all designated states KENDALL SQUARE RESEARCH CORPORATION One Kendall Square Cambridge Massachusetts 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frank, Steven J. 6 Tiffany Trail Hopkinton Massachusetts 01748 / US | 02 /
Burkhardt Henry III 7 Gales Point Manchester Massachusetts 01944 / US | 03 /
Weber, Frederick D. 28 Hurlbut Street Cambridge Massachusetts 02138 / US | [1989/26] | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/50] | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | ||
Former [1989/26] | Hughes, Brian Patrick, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 88311138.7 | 24.11.1988 | [1989/26] | Priority number, date | US19870136701 | 22.12.1987 Original published format: US 136701 | [1989/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0322116 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0322116 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0322116 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, H04L12/42 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
G06F15/17337 (EP);
H04L12/433 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/29] | G06F15/06, G06F15/16, H04L12/42 | ||
Former IPC [1989/26] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/26] | Title | German: | Zwischenverbindungssystem für Multiprozessorstruktur | [1989/26] | English: | Interconnect system for multiprocessor structure | [1989/26] | French: | Système d'interconnexion pour une structure multiprocesseur | [1989/26] | Examination procedure | 21.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/13] | 11.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M12) | 29.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 26.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 11.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP99201131.2 / EP0936778 | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01] | Request for further processing for: | 08.10.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 11.10.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.11.1999 | Decision despatched | 09.04.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 09.04.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 26.04.1999 | Decision despatched | 29.11.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 29.11.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 18.12.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1994 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   18.05.1995 | 30.11.1996 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   20.02.1997 | 30.11.1997 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   19.05.1998 | 30.11.1998 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   21.01.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.01.2000 | BE | 19.01.2000 | CH | 19.01.2000 | ES | 19.01.2000 | GR | 19.01.2000 | IT | 19.01.2000 | LI | 19.01.2000 | [2008/01] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 19.01.2000 | |
BE | 19.01.2000 | ||
CH | 19.01.2000 | ||
ES | 19.01.2000 | ||
GR | 19.01.2000 | ||
LI | 19.01.2000 | ||
Former [2002/24] | AT | 19.01.2000 | |
BE | 19.01.2000 | ||
CH | 19.01.2000 | ||
ES | 19.01.2000 | ||
LI | 19.01.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 19.01.2000 | |
BE | 19.01.2000 | ||
CH | 19.01.2000 | ||
LI | 19.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 19.01.2000 | |
LI | 19.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | CH | 25.04.2000 | |
LI | 25.04.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0014926 (CSELT CENTRO STUDI LAB TELECOM [IT]); | [A]US4622631 (FRANK STEVEN J [US], et al) | Examination | EP0110569 |