EP0318330 - Glutathione esters for treating ventricular arrhythmia [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/22] | Therapeutic agents for ischemic heart diseases | ||
[1993/24] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.02.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 23.03.1994 [1994/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMANOUCHI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/22] | For all designated states YAMANOUCHI PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD. No. 3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asano, Masaharu 1-10-A206, Aioi-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174 / JP | 02 /
Uchida, Wataru 3-41-16-502, Hikawadai Nerima-ku Tokyo 174 / JP | 03 /
Shibasaki, Kumiko 3-27-B1107, Nakadai Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174 / JP | [1989/22] | Representative(s) | Geering, Keith Edwin, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/22] | Geering, Keith Edwin, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 88311240.1 | 28.11.1988 | [1989/22] | Priority number, date | JP19870298759 | 26.11.1987 Original published format: JP 29875987 | [1989/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0318330 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0318330 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K37/02 | [1989/22] | CPC: |
A61K38/063 (EP,US);
A61K31/195 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/22] | Title | German: | Glutathionester zur Behandlung ventrikulärer Arrhythmie | [1993/24] | English: | Glutathione esters for treating ventricular arrhythmia | [1993/24] | French: | Traitement de l'arrhythmie ventriculaire par des esters du glutathion | [1993/24] |
Former [1989/22] | Therapeutika zur Behandlung ischämischer Herzkrankheiten | ||
Former [1989/22] | Therapeutic agents for ischemic heart diseases | ||
Former [1989/22] | Agents thérapeutiques pour le traitement des maladies ischémiques du coeur | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 05.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/10] | 19.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/12] | 01.11.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/12] | Request for further processing for: | 12.03.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 12.03.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.04.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0204589 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) | [Y] - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF SURGERY, vol. 12, no. 2, 1982, pages 87-92; J. AMANO et al.: "Effect of glutathion pretreatment on hypothermic ischemic cardioplegia" | [Y] - J. MOL. CELL. CARDIOL. (CONGRESS SEPTEMBER 1987), vol. 19, suppl. III, 1987, page 11, abstract no. 32; C. CECONJ et al.: "The role of glutathion status in the protection against ischaenic and reperfusion damage: Effects of N-acetylcysteine" | [A] - MED. SCI. RES., vol. 15, no. 7, 1987, pages 391-392; A. ARDUIM et al.: "Glutathione and glutathione related enzymes in ischemic and reperfused rat heart" | [A] - FREE RADICAL RES. COMMUN., vol. 4, no. 1, 1987, pages 27-30, Harwood Academic Publishers GmbH, GB; F.J. ROMERO et al.: "Myocardial glutathione alternations in acute coronary occlusion in the dog" |