EP0341363 - Precision operational amplifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.1993 | Change - withdrawal | published on 24.03.1993 [1993/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAXIM INTEGRATED PRODUCTS 120 San Gabriel Drive Sunnyvale California 94086 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | For all designated states MAXIM INTEGRATED PRODUCTS 120 San Gabriel Drive Sunnyvale California 94086 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schaffer, Gregory L. 885 Ratan Terrace Sunnyvale California 94086 / US | [1989/46] | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis, et al Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | Wombwell, Francis, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 88311332.6 | 30.11.1988 | [1989/46] | Priority number, date | US19880193258 | 11.05.1988 Original published format: US 193258 | [1989/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0341363 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0341363 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/45, H03F1/30 | [1989/46] | CPC: |
H03F1/304 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/46] | Title | German: | Präzisionsoperationsverstärker | [1989/46] | English: | Precision operational amplifier | [1989/46] | French: | Amplificateur opérationnel de précision | [1989/46] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/36] | 16.01.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1374950 (IBM); | [A]US4462002 (SCHADE JR OTTO H [US]) | [X] - ELECTRONICS INTERNATIONAL, vol. 54, no. 16, August 1981, pages 109-112, New York, US; R. KASH: "Building quality analog circuits with C-MOS logic arrays" |