Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.1993 [1993/23] |
30.04.1992 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.06.1992 [1992/25] |
04.04.1991 | First examination report | |
29.08.1990 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.10.1990 [1990/42] |
15.03.1990 | Publication of search report | published on 02.05.1990 [1990/18] |
22.04.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.06.1989 [1989/23] |