Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU610279B | Global Dossier | 16.05.1991 | B2 | AU2514588 | 08.06.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US12879287 | 04.12.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0319299 | Global Dossier | 17.06.1992 | B1 | EP0319299 | 02.05.1990 | A3 | EP0319299 | 07.06.1989 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US12879287 | 04.12.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1310275 | 17.11.1992 | C | Priority number | Date | US12879287 | 04.12.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3872186T | 14.01.1993 | T2 | DE3872186D1 | 23.07.1992 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US12879287 | 04.12.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH01190910 | 01.08.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US12879287 | 04.12.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR970001438B | 06.02.1997 | B1 | KR890009455 | 02.08.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US12879287 | 04.12.1987 |