EP0323041 - Infant security system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.1993 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.1993 [1993/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wolk, Barry M. 58 Graymore Lane Olympia Fields Illinois 60461 / US | For all designated states Newman, Edward H. 2371 Bryden Road Colombus Ohio 43209 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states Wolk, Barry M. 58 Graymore Lane Olympia Fields Illinois 60461 / US | ||
For all designated states Newman, Edward H. 2371 Bryden Road Colombus Ohio 43209 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Evershed, Michael, et al Saunders & Dolleymore 9, Rickmansworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | Evershed, Michael, et al Saunders & Dolleymore 9, Rickmansworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB | Application number, filing date | 88311403.5 | 01.12.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | US19870129627 | 07.12.1987 Original published format: US 129627 | [1989/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0323041 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0323041 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/14, G08B25/00 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
G08B21/0227 (EP,US);
G08B13/14 (EP,US);
G08B21/0286 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/27] | Title | German: | Sicherheitssystem für Kinder | [1989/27] | English: | Infant security system | [1989/27] | French: | Système de sécurité pour enfants | [1989/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 31.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/22] | 14.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/26] | 01.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8706748 (F B NUTTER ENTERPRISES INC D B [US]); | [A]EP0073681 (SINGH KUNWAR CHANDER JEET [GB]); | [AP]EP0268349 (RJS SECURITY & TRACKING SYST [CA]) |