Cited in | Search | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | WO8804300
[XPD] (UNIVERSITY PATENTS INC [US]) | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [XD] - NATURE, Vol. 324, 4th December 1986, pages 429-433, A.J. ZAUG et al.: "The Tetrahymena ribozyme acts like an RNA restriction endonuclease". | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [X] - CELL, Vol. 35, Part 2, December 1983, pages 849-857, C. GUERRIER-TAKADA et al.: "The RNA moiety of ribonuclease P is the catalytic subunit of the enzyme". | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [XD] - NATURE, Vol. 328, 13th August 1987, pages 596-601, O.C. UHLENBECK: "A small catalytic oligoribonucleotide". | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [Y] - NATO ASI SERIES A (Plant Mol. Biol.), Vol. 140, 1987, pages 495-502, G. BRUENING et al.: "Non-enzymatic cleavage and ligation of a plant satellite RNA". | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [Y] - NATURE, Vol. 323, 25th September 1986, pages 349-353, J.M. BUZAYAN et al.: "Non-enzymatic cleavage and ligation of RNAs complementary to a plant virus satellite RNA". | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [YD] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, Vol. 83, December 1986, pages 8859-8862, J.M. BUZAYAN et al.: "Satellite tobacco ringspot virus RNA: A subset of the RNA sequence is sufficient for autolytic processing". | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [YD] - CELL, Vol. 50, July 3, 1987, pages 9-16, Cell Press, A.C. FORSTER et al.: "Self-cleavage of virusoid RNA is performed by the proposed 55-nucleotide active site". | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [YD] - CELL, Vol. 49, April 24, 1987, pages 211-220, Cell Press, A.C. FORSTER et al.: "Self-cleavage of plus and minus RNAs of a virusoid and a structural model for the active sites". | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [XPD] - NATURE, Vol. 334, 18th August 1988, pages 585-591, J. HASELOFF et al.: "Simple RNA enzymes with new and highly specific endoribonuclease activities". | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [XP] - NATURE, Vol. 334, 21st July 1988, pages 196-197, V. WALBOT et al.: "Plant development and ribozymes for pathogens". |