blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0321201

EP0321201 - Ribozymes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  08.10.2004
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gene Shears Pty Limited
Administration Building CNR Barry Drive-Clunies Ross Street GPO Box 1600
Canberra, ACT 2601 / AU
[N/P]
Former [2004/48]For all designated states
GENE SHEARS PTY LIMITED
Administration Building CNR Barry Drive-Clunies Ross Street GPO Box 1600
Canberra, ACT 2601 / AU
Former [1999/20]For all designated states
Gene Shears Pty Limited
Administration Building CNR Barry Drive-Clunies Ross Street GPO Box 1600
Canberra, ACT 2601 / AU
Former [1997/21]For all designated states
Gene Shears Pty Limited
Suite 1, Building 5, 105 Delhi Road
North Ryde, NSW 2113 / AU
Former [1994/38]For all designated states
GENE SHEARS PTY. LIMITED
A.C.N. 008 651 410, Level 2, 154 Pacific Highway
St. Leonards, NSW 2065 / AU
Former [1990/37]For all designated states
GENE SHEARS PTY. LIMITED
c/o Macphillamy Cummins & Gibson 10th Floor, National Mutual Centre Darwin Place
Canberra City / AU
Former [1989/25]For all designated states
COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION
407 Royal Parade
Parkville, VIC 3052 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / Gerlach, Wayne Lyle
22 Goble Street
Hughes, Austr. Capital Territory, 2605 / AU
02 / Haseloff, James Phillip
17 Hemmant Street
O'Connor, Austr. Capital Territory, 2601 / AU
03 / Jennings, Philip Anthony
13 Lobelia Street
West Chatswood, New South Wales, 2066 / AU
04 / Cameron, Fiona Helen
No. 2 Rounce Avenue
Forestville, New South Wales, 2087 / AU
[1989/25]
Representative(s)Almond-Martin, Carol, et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1996/25]Almond-Martin, Carol, et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A., 62 rue de Bonnel
69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR
Former [1992/17]Feiler, Lothar (DE)
Patentanwälte Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37
D-81675 München / DE
Former [1989/25]Stuart, Ian Alexander
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date88311816.814.12.1988
[1989/25]
Priority number, dateAU1987000591115.12.1987         Original published format: AU 591187
AU1988000995019.08.1988         Original published format: AU 995088
AU1988000035309.09.1988         Original published format: AU 35388
AU1988000130404.11.1988         Original published format: AU 130488
AU1988000133307.11.1988         Original published format: AU 133388
[1989/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0321201
Date:21.06.1989
Language:EN
[1989/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0321201
Date:10.01.1990
Language:EN
[1990/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0321201
Date:21.12.1994
Language:EN
[1994/51]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0321201
Date:24.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.1989
ClassificationIPC:C12N9/00, C07H21/02, C12N15/00, C12P19/34, A01N57/16
[1989/25]
CPC:
C12N15/113 (EP,KR,US); A01N57/16 (EP); A01N63/00 (KR);
A01N63/60 (EP,US); A61K38/00 (EP,KR); A61P31/12 (EP);
C12N15/8218 (EP,KR); C12N2310/12 (EP,KR); C12N2310/121 (EP);
C12N2310/124 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/25]
TitleGerman:Ribozyme[1989/25]
English:Ribozymes[1989/25]
French:Ribozymes[1989/25]
Examination proceduredeletedDecision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No
28.03.1990Examination requested  [1990/22]
20.11.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.05.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.06.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.1993Request for accelerated examination filed
26.11.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.06.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.07.1994Fee for grant paid
19.07.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP94107862.8  / EP0640688
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.09.1995  04.10.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Ribozyme Pharmaceuticals Incorporated
2950 Wilderness Place
Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/35]
Opponent(s)01  20.09.1995  04.10.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Ribozyme Pharmaceuticals Incorporated
2950 Wilderness Place
Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1995/46]
Opponent(s)01  20.09.1995  04.10.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Ribozyme Pharmaceuticals Incorporated
2950 Wilderness Place
Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US
Opponent's representative
VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
D-81675 München / DE
26.10.1995Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.07.1996Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.09.1999Date of oral proceedings
01.10.1999Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.1999Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.01.2000Reply to a communication from the opposition division
17.03.2000Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
21.07.2000Reply to a communication from the opposition division
18.09.2000Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
16.12.2003Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.06.2004Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
23.09.2004Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition23.11.2000Appeal received No.  T1127/00
26.01.2001Statement of grounds filed
16.12.2003Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
23.11.2000Appeal received No.  T1127/00
23.11.2000Statement of grounds filed
16.12.2003Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
16.12.2003Date of oral proceedings
22.12.2003Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
18.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XPD]WO8804300  (UNIVERSITY PATENTS INC [US])
 [XD]  - NATURE, Vol. 324, 4th December 1986, pages 429-433, A.J. ZAUG et al.: "The Tetrahymena ribozyme acts like an RNA restriction endonuclease".
 [X]  - CELL, Vol. 35, Part 2, December 1983, pages 849-857, C. GUERRIER-TAKADA et al.: "The RNA moiety of ribonuclease P is the catalytic subunit of the enzyme".
 [XD]  - NATURE, Vol. 328, 13th August 1987, pages 596-601, O.C. UHLENBECK: "A small catalytic oligoribonucleotide".
 [Y]  - NATO ASI SERIES A (Plant Mol. Biol.), Vol. 140, 1987, pages 495-502, G. BRUENING et al.: "Non-enzymatic cleavage and ligation of a plant satellite RNA".
 [Y]  - NATURE, Vol. 323, 25th September 1986, pages 349-353, J.M. BUZAYAN et al.: "Non-enzymatic cleavage and ligation of RNAs complementary to a plant virus satellite RNA".
 [YD]  - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, Vol. 83, December 1986, pages 8859-8862, J.M. BUZAYAN et al.: "Satellite tobacco ringspot virus RNA: A subset of the RNA sequence is sufficient for autolytic processing".
 [YD]  - CELL, Vol. 50, July 3, 1987, pages 9-16, Cell Press, A.C. FORSTER et al.: "Self-cleavage of virusoid RNA is performed by the proposed 55-nucleotide active site".
 [YD]  - CELL, Vol. 49, April 24, 1987, pages 211-220, Cell Press, A.C. FORSTER et al.: "Self-cleavage of plus and minus RNAs of a virusoid and a structural model for the active sites".
 [XPD]  - NATURE, Vol. 334, 18th August 1988, pages 585-591, J. HASELOFF et al.: "Simple RNA enzymes with new and highly specific endoribonuclease activities".
 [XP]  - NATURE, Vol. 334, 21st July 1988, pages 196-197, V. WALBOT et al.: "Plant development and ribozymes for pathogens".
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.