EP0322221 - Elastic strand construction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.1997 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sipinen, Alan J. c/o Minnesota Min.& Manuf. Comp. 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Wood, Leigh E. c/o Minnesota Min. & Manuf. Comp. 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
Eaton, Bradley W. c/o Minn. Min. & Manuf. Comp. 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [1989/26] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88312126.1 | 21.12.1988 | [1989/26] | Priority number, date | US19870137258 | 23.12.1987 Original published format: US 137258 | [1989/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0322221 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0322221 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0322221 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/12, B29C43/34, A61F13/15, // B29L31:00, B29K21:00 | [1996/11] | CPC: |
A61F13/49019 (EP);
A61F13/15 (KR);
B29C43/222 (EP);
B29C48/05 (EP);
B29C48/08 (EP);
B29C48/12 (EP);
B29C48/305 (EP);
B29C59/022 (EP);
B29C48/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1989/26] | B29C47/12, B29C43/34, A41B13/02, // B29L31:00, B29K21:00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/26] | Title | German: | Aufbau eines elastischen Bandes | [1989/26] | English: | Elastic strand construction | [1989/26] | French: | Construction d'un ruban élastique | [1989/26] | Examination procedure | 11.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/45] | 21.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 13.03.1996 | ES | 13.03.1996 | LI | 13.03.1996 | NL | 13.03.1996 | SE | 13.06.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/24] | CH | 13.03.1996 | |
ES | 13.03.1996 | ||
LI | 13.03.1996 | ||
SE | 13.06.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | CH | 13.03.1996 | |
LI | 13.03.1996 | ||
SE | 13.06.1996 | ||
Former [1996/44] | SE | 13.06.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB952419 (AMERICAN VISCOSE CORP); | [A]US3164948 (STRATFORD EDWIN H); | [A]BE674134 ; | [X]FR1563155 ; | [A]DE1704986 (SANDER NACHF FR); | [X]US4079114 (BONNER WILLIAM JAMES); | [X]US4300562 (PIENIAK HEINZ A); | [A]EP0095034 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]); | [X]DE3423644 (HARTMANN PAUL AG [DE]) |