EP0323162 - New use of catechol-o-methyl transferase (comt) inhibitors and their physiologically acceptable salts and esters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORION-YHTYMÄ OY Orionintie 1, PL 65 02101 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states ORION-YHTYMÄ OY Orionintie 1, PL 65 SF-02101 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states ORION-YHTYMA OY Orionintie 1 FIN-02200 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aho, Paivi Caloniuksenkatu 2 C 70 SF-00100 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
Pohto, Pentti Casentreninkatu 6 A 17 SF-00530 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
Linden, Inge-Britt Vattuniemenkatu 4 C 52 SF-00210 Helsinki / FI | 04 /
Backstrom, Reijo Vaakamestarinpolku 4 B 19 SF-00750 Helsinki / FI | 05 /
Honkanen, Erkki Kuusitie 13 SF-01400 Vantaa / FI | 06 /
Nissinen, Erkki Sarkitie 21 SF-02170 Espoo / FI | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Sexton, Jane Helen, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | Sexton, Jane Helen, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 88312228.5 | 22.12.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | GB19870030190 | 24.12.1987 Original published format: GB 8730190 | GB19880020729 | 01.09.1988 Original published format: GB 8820729 | [1989/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0323162 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0323162 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0323162 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/12, A61K31/00, A61K31/06, A61K31/275, A61K31/165, A61K31/19, A61K31/22, A61K31/11 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
A61K31/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/12 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, GR, NL [1989/27] | Title | German: | Anwendung von Catechol-o-methyl-transferase(COMT)-Inhibitoren sowie deren physiologisch akzeptablen Salze und Ester | [1989/27] | English: | New use of catechol-o-methyl transferase (comt) inhibitors and their physiologically acceptable salts and esters | [1989/27] | French: | Utilisation d'inhibiteurs de la catéchol-o-méthyl-transférase (comt) et leurs sels et esters physiologiquement acceptables | [1989/27] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 24.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2607493 [ ] (ORION YHTYMAE OY [FI]) | Examination | - TER. ARKH., vol. 53, no. 6, 1981; V.I. KULINSKY et al., pp. 114-116# | - ZH. EKSP. KLIN. MED., vol. 25, no. 6, 1985; S.A. MIRZOYAN et al., pp. 519-524# | - EUR. J. OF PHARMAC., vol. 153, nos. 2-3, 24 August 1988, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V. (NL); E. NISSINEN et al., pp. 263-269# |