EP0374324 - Improved quench ring for a gasifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.1993 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.06.1993 [1993/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 2000 Westchester Avenue White Plains New York 10650 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 2000 Westchester Avenue White Plains, New York 10650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Den Bleyker, Alfred Leonard 1605 Turnpike Houston TX 77008 / US | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 88312240.0 | 22.12.1988 | [1990/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0374324 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0374324 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C10J3/48 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
C10J3/485 (EP,US);
C10J3/845 (EP,US);
C10K1/101 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1223 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/26] | Title | German: | Quenchring für Gaserzeuger | [1990/26] | English: | Improved quench ring for a gasifier | [1990/26] | French: | Anneau de trempe modifié pour gazogène | [1990/26] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 14.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0160424 (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]) |