EP0323184 - Halogenated anthraquinones useful as near infrared absorbing optical filters, and method of making them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.03.1995 [1995/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohyamata, Tsukasa 2-13, Koganemachi Ohmuta-shi Fukuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Takuma, Keisuke 300, Hirabarumachi Ohmuta-shi Fukuoka-ken / JP | 03 /
Kuroda, Shizuo 41-9, Ohazakusagi Ohmuta-shi Fukuoka-ken / JP | 04 /
Aiga, Hiroshi 78, Shozanmachi Ohmuta-shi Fukuoka-ken / JP | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Harvey, David Gareth, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | Harvey, David Gareth, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 88312285.5 | 23.12.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | JP19870330163 | 28.12.1987 Original published format: JP 33016387 | [1989/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0323184 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0323184 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C09B1/32, G11B7/24 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
G11B7/252 (EP,US);
C09B1/00 (KR);
C09B1/325 (EP,US);
G11B7/244 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1989/27] | Title | German: | Halogenierte Anthrachinone, verwendbar als im nahen Infrarotbereich absorbierende optische Filter und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1989/27] | English: | Halogenated anthraquinones useful as near infrared absorbing optical filters, and method of making them | [1989/27] | French: | Anthraquinones halogénées utilisables comme filtres optiques absorbant l'infrarouge proche et méthode pour leur préparation | [1989/27] | Examination procedure | 19.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/08] | 18.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPH01291651 [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | Examination | JPS61291651 |