EP0323236 - Variable-ratio transmissions, separately and in bicycles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1996 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAMLIN TRANSMISSION CORPORATION Suite No. 1 35, Danbury Road Wilton Connecticut 06897 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states HAMLIN TRANSMISSION CORPORATION Suite No. 1 35, Danbury Road Wilton Connecticut 06897 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leonard, George Hamlin 327, Hollowtree Ridge Road Darien, Connecticut 06820 / US | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Mounteney, Simon James, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | Mounteney, Simon James, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | ||
Former [1995/14] | Lawson, David Glynne MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | ||
Former [1989/27] | Sturt, Clifford Mark MARKS & CLERK 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 88312371.3 | 28.12.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | US19870140232 | 31.12.1987 Original published format: US 140232 | [1989/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0323236 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0323236 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0323236 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B62M9/08, F16H9/10 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
B62M9/04 (KR);
B62M9/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/27] | Title | German: | Wechselgetriebe mit veränderlichem Übersetzungsverhältnis an sich und bei Fahrrädern | [1989/27] | English: | Variable-ratio transmissions, separately and in bicycles | [1989/27] | French: | Transmission à rapport variable, en soi et aux bicyclettes | [1989/27] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1995/14: Teilanmeldung 92203182.8 eingereicht am 28/12/88 | EPB 1995/14: Divisional application 92203182.8 filed on 28/12/88 | EPB 1995/14: Demande divisionnaire 92203182.8 déposée le 28/12/88 | Examination procedure | 13.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/02] | 02.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP92203182.8 / EP0524709 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 05.04.1995 | ES | 05.04.1995 | IT | 05.04.1995 | LI | 05.04.1995 | SE | 05.07.1995 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | CH | 05.04.1995 | |
IT | 05.04.1995 | ||
LI | 05.04.1995 | ||
SE | 05.07.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | CH | 05.04.1995 | |
LI | 05.04.1995 | ||
SE | 05.07.1995 | ||
Former [1995/44] | CH | 05.04.1995 | |
LI | 05.04.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4030373 (LEONARD HAMLIN); | [XD]US4530676 (LEONARD HAMLIN [US]); | [A]GB191506539 (PROSOROVSKY NICOLAUS [RU]); | [A]US1776339 (SIQUELAND TOBIAS M); | [A]US4634406 (HUFSCHMID ERIC B [US]) |